Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01665
Date Filed2018-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the appointment of members to the National Park System Advisory Board. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told DFF that it would invoke a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5588144) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Guzman, Javier) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-08-023MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Travis Annatoyn, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- 1333 H Street, N.W., Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-448-9090. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5617763. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-024NOTICE of Proof of Service by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-03MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of TRAVIS ANNATOYN. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/3/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-075LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-10t (zjf, ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar