Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01669
Date Filed2018-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Services submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for an Excel spreadsheet providing data contained on Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals applications. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Immigration Studies filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5588375) filed by Center for Immigration Studies. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for USCIS)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-17Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-172SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-183LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/25/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2018. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/23/2018 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-017NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-278ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER. Because the plaintiff pursues this action under the Freedom of Information Act, the initial disclosure requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A) are not implicated and no scheduling conference need be held. See Local Civ. R. 16.3(b)(10). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before November 2, 2018, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report proposing a schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions, oppositions thereto, and replies. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 3, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar