Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLORANCE v. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01710
Date Filed2018-07-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCLINT A. LORANCE
Case DescriptionClint Lorance submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning an investigation of four Afghani men. The agency acknowledged receipt of the records. It later told Lorance that its Office of Provost Marshal General had found no records. Lorance filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency then told Lorance that its first response was incorrect and that the records were being withheld under Exemption 1 (national security). Lorance then filed an administrative appeal of the agency's corrected decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Lorance filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-221COMPLAINT against ARMY with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5599000) filed by CLINT A LORANCE.(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/22/2018)
2018-07-222CIVIL COVER SHEET by CLINT A LORANCE re 1 Complaint filed by CLINT A LORANCE. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by CLINT A LORANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Summons US Attorneys Office, # 6 Summons Attorney General's Office, # 7 Summons Dep't of the Army)(Maher, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/2/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 07/22/2018)
2018-07-283CIVIL COVER SHEET by CLINT A. LORANCE filed by CLINT A. LORANCE.(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/28/2018)
2018-07-284ERRATA by CLINT A. LORANCE 1 Complaint filed by CLINT A. LORANCE. (Maher, John) (Entered: 07/28/2018)
2018-07-30Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-315REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CLINT A. LORANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Dept. of Army, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Maher, John) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-316SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-067STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 6, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-178NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-119ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY.(Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-2510MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Meet & Confer Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by October 25, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 25, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2511Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by November 21, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 25, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-2112NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Roberto Cesar Martens, Jr on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY Substituting for attorney Jeremy A. Haugh (Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-2113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by December 20, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 26, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-2014Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 31, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 20, 2018. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019. (tg) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-3115Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Martens, Roberto) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by March 7, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar