Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01758
Date Filed2018-07-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning two files with the classification 266, which refers to domestic terrorism. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5608673) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/7/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2018. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-09-065NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-066ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 21, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/7/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-217PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Denise) Modified event title on 9/26/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: (1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by November 16, 2018; (2) Plaintiffs shall their opposition to Defendant's motion and their cross-motion for summary judgment by December 20, 2018; (3) Defendant shall file its reply and opposition to Plaintiffs' motion by January 31, 2019; and (4) Plaintiffs shall file their reply by February 21, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/24/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/16/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/20/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2019. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar