Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSADLER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01695
Date Filed2018-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUSTIN J. SADLER
Case DescriptionJustin Sadler, a federal prisoner, asked the Bureau of Prisons to remove his sex offender designation because it interfered with his prison designation. Sadler cites the FOIA, but this is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-16Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/16/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-161COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JUSTIN J. SADLER.(zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-162MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JUSTIN J. SADLER (zsb) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-08-164ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $70.86 from Prison Account of JUSTIN J. SADLER and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/9/2018. (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-27Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-11-145SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-196VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 11/20/2018 ..... In order to avoid a mandatory dismissal of this action, on or before December 14, 2018, Plaintiff shall either (1) cause process to be served upon Defendants and file proof of service with the Court, or (2) file a motion to enlarge time to serve process and show good cause, if any, for failure to serve process in a timely fashion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/19/2018. (lctjk1) Modified on 12/17/2018 (zsb). (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's November 19, 2018 6 Order is VACATED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-077MOTION for Leave to Effect Service Via USMS by JUSTIN J. SADLER. (tth) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/12/2018) (ztth). (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-13MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Effect Service 7 is DENIED as moot. Summons were issued on 11/14/2018 and the United States Marshals Service is already tasked with executing service. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/13/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-268MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion to Stay for good cause shown. This case shall be temporarily stayed until January 28, 2019, at which time Defendant is obligated to file its answer or initial dispositive motion. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/28/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-029RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/3/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/2/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/3/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 12/3/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/3/2018 (ztd) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-2210Second MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Motion to Stay. The case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, within seven days after funding is restored for the Department of Justice, Defendant shall file a status report with a proposed deadline for Defendant's response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/23/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-3111STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendants' 11 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is EXTENDED to February 25, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the stay in this case is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/1/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar