Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01764
Date Filed2018-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted ten FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning potential conflicts of interest involving Deputy Secretary of the Interior David Bernhardt. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5609134) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Guzman, Javier) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-302LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (zmd) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-313STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/31/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-014SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-095NOTICE of Proof of Service by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10NOTICE OF ERROR: Document No. re 5 NOTICE of Proof of Service was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading as to the correct docket event (jf) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/7/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/8/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 8/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-307MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Travis Annatoyn, :Firm- Democracy Forward Foundation, :Address- P.O. Box 34553, Washington, D.C. 20043. Phone No. - 202-448-9090. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 7 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Travis Annatoyn is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/4/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-068NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-079ENTERED IN ERROR.....ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Cohen, Jason) Modified on 9/11/2018 (jf). (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-0710ANSWER to Complaint (Corrected filing) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Answer to Complaint was entered in error and refiled by counsel with correct case caption/number. (See Docket Entry 10 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-2911MOTION to Order Status Report by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Annatoyn, Travis) Modified on 10/31/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-31MINUTE ORDER granting 11 plaintiff's motion to order status report. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 15, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/31/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/15/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15MINUTE ORDER in view of 12 parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/15/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-1713Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of 13 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report updating the Court by no later than January 9, 2019. The defendant is directed to provide a response to plaintiff's questions by December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/19/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2019 (mac) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-0814MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-09MINUTE ORDER granting 14 unopposed motion to stay in light of lapse of appropriations. Defendant is directed to notify the Court when appropriations are restored or if a continuing resolution is enacted. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/9/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-2915NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-04MINUTE ORDER. In view of 15 Notice of Restored Government Funding, the parties are directed to file a joint status report by no later than February 22, 2019 with a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/4/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2019. (mac) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2216STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2217STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-22MINUTE ORDER. In view of 16 Defendant's Status Report and 17 Plaintiff's Status Report, the parties shall meet and confer, and file a Joint Status Report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/22/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2019. (mac) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-0818Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 18 Joint Status Report, the parties shall meet and confer, and file a joint status report with a schedule for production and a recommendation for further proceedings by no later April 12, 2019. The Court declines to adopt Plaintiff's proposal for a briefing schedule substantially for the reasons set forth in Defendant's proposal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/11/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2019. (mac) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-04-1219Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-12MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than May 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/12/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2019. (mac) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-05-1320Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-14MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 20 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/14/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2019. (mac) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-07-1221Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 21 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than August 12, 2019, proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/15/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2019. (mac) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-08-1222Joint STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Annatoyn, Travis) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-13MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 22 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than September 19, 2019, proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings. The parties shall file a proposed order with each joint status report. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/13/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2019. (mac) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-09-1923Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-19MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 23 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than November 18, 2019, proposing a joint recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/19/2019. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar