Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01799
Date Filed2018-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Commerce for records concerning a number of political appointments. DFF also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-311COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5613413) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-073LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/6/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 8/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-165NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-056Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than September 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responsive Pleading to Complaint due by 9/12/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-127ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-138ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 27, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/13/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-279Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 September 27, 2018, Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another Joint Status Report, on or before October 29, 2018, that updates the court on their progress and, if necessary, proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/28/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/29/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-30MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report no later than November 29, 2018, updating the court on the agency's search and production efforts in response to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/30/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar