Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEstate of Wayne A. Jones, by Robert L. Jones and Bruce A. Jones v. The United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of West Virginia
CityMartinsburg
Case Number3:2018cv00121
Date Filed2018-07-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Gina M. Groh
PlaintiffEstate of Wayne A. Jones, by Robert L. Jones and Bruce A. Jones Administrators of the Estate of Wayne A. Jones
Case DescriptionThe Estate of Wayne A. Jones submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's investigation of Jones' death. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jones' estate filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantThe United States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-311COMPLAINT against The United States Department of Justice, filed by Estate of Wayne A. Jones, by Robert L. Jones and Bruce A. Jones. Filing Fee $400.00 - Receipt #0424-2637303. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated August 8, 2017, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated August 21, 2017, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter dated September 18, 2017, and # 4 Civil Cover Sheet). (cwm) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-312Corporate Disclosure Statement by Estate of Wayne A. Jones, by Robert L. Jones and Bruce A. Jones. (cwm) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-09-044Federal Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated August 21, 2018)(Altmeyer, Helen) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar