Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01800
Date Filed2018-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for emails sent by either former FBI director James Comey or former FBI chief of staff James Rybicki from a personal email account pertaining to the conduct of agency business. OIG acknowledged receipt of the request. Cause of Action also submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for the same records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Cause of Action also submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Information Policy for emails sent by Sarah Isgur Flores on a non-governmental account responding to news accounts that Attorney General Jeff Sessions had met with Russians during the 2016 Presidential campaign. OIP acknowledged receipt of the request. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Cause of Action filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5613837) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons DOJ, # 10 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 11 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-012Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-013NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/06/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/6/2018 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-158NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-09-059ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0610ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 20, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/06/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-2011Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before October 22, 2018, and every 30 days thereafter until the completion of production. The status report filed after the completion of production shall advise the court whether the parties intend to litigate this matter further and, if so, propose a briefing schedule for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2018. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar