Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01803
Date Filed2018-08-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records provided by the agency to Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, or Pioneer Credit Recovery in response to discovery requests issued in connection with litigation brought against the companies by the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5614166) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-013MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robyn K. Bitner, :Firm- National Student Legal Defense Network, :Address- 1015 15th Street NW, Suite 600, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-734-7495. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5614297. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsth) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-014STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/1/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-015SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER granting the 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robyn K. Bitner. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-086NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/3/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/2/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/7/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 8/6/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-048ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-059ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for October 3, 2018 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/5/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-05Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-1310Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion to Adjourn Conference by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-13MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 10 Join Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for October 3, 2018 is hereby VACATED. The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by October 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/13/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1311MOTION to Vacate Status Hearing by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (See Docket Entry 10 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by November 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/18/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-11-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by December 17, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/15/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1514Joint STATUS REPORT corrected by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar