Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01817
Date Filed2018-08-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning several entities and individuals involved with the organization Human Rights Accountability Global Initiative Foundation. Property of the People and Shapiro also requested a fee waiver. The FBI issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Property of the People and Shapiro filed an administrative appeal of that decision, which was upheld. Property of the People and Shapiro also submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning Russian lawyer Natalia Veselnitskaya and correspondence with Prevezon Holdings. Property of the People and Shapiro also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Property of the People's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5618529) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-02Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-022SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-023LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-034STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/3/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/10/2018; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/7/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/07/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/6/2018.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-066NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-067ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 9, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/10/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar