Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleYoung v. (OGIS)(FOIA) et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv05313
Date Filed2018-08-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Virginia M. Kendall
PlaintiffGwendolyn Young
Defendant(OGIS)(FOIA)
DefendantCopyright Office
DefendantLAF
DefendantCFPB
DefendantCircuit Court of Cook County Illinois
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-031RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Gwendolyn Young (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-032PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-033APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Young for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-034MOTION by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Young for attorney representation (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-035PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Gwendolyn Young (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0316NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (dlc, ) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-1517ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/15/2018. The Court cannot make a determination on Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 3 or motion for attorney representation 4 until deciding whether Plaintiffs claim may go forward. Therefore, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with the lawsuit filed before this Court, she must file an amended complaint by September 4, 2018 that alleges exactly why the entities she names as defendants are the ones responsible for a violation of her civil rights. Failure to file an amended complaint by this date may result in dismissal of the case. Mailed notice(lk, ) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-2818LETTER titled Complaint by Gwendolyn Young dated 8/18/18. (Exhibits). (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar