Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Human Rights Defense Center et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01141
Date Filed2018-08-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas S. Zilly
PlaintiffThe Human Rights Defense Center
PlaintiffMichelle Dillon
Case DescriptionThe Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning litigation against ICE or its employees since 2010 resulting in awards of more than $1,000. The Human Rights Defense Center also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request because it did not adequately describe the records requested. The Human Rights Defense Center filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, HRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [10]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-031COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Receipt # 0981-5421921), filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-07Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-072Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Main document - U S Dept of Homeland Security) (Attachments: # 1 Summons United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement)(CDA) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-073AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed by The Human Rights Defense Center, Michelle Dillon.(Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-204APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deborah M. Golden FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5440438 (Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-205ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deborah M Golden for Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon and for The Human Rights Defense Center, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-226AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-227AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-238AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Department of Homeland Security on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-239AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 8/7/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Dillon, The Human Rights Defense Center. (Stahl, Eric) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-0510ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0611NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0612ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar