Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department Of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv07097
Date Filed2018-08-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for a December 2014 memo from the Office of Legal Counsel to the Counsel to the President concerning authority to use military force in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Savage and the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-071COMPLAINT against Department Of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15418838)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-073RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Grupo Financiero Inbursa, S.A.B. de C.V. for The New York Times Company. Document filed by The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-074REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department Of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-08CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-085ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Justice. (jgo) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-276NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of Department Of Justice. (Lee, Casey) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar