Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01860
Date Filed2018-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffBRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW
PlaintiffCHARLES KURZMAN
Case DescriptionThe Brennan Center for Justice submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records from the LIONS database involving public charges listed under six categories related to terrorism. The Brennan Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the Brennan Center's request for expedited processing, but granted its request for a fee waiver. The agency responded to the Brennan Center's request by indicating that the information it sought was available on DOJ's website. The Brennan Center filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy upheld the denial of expedited processing as well as the referral to the website, adding that some personal information was properly redacted under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The Brennan Center then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5627390) filed by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, Charles Kurzman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-082STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/8/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/19/2018. (Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/20/2018. (Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-206RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Proof of Service on Civil Docket Clerk, US Department of Justice)(Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-187NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Evan Kahn on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-188ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 5, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/19/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-20Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2018, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-209MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan M. Moses, :Firm- Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-403-1000. Fax No. - 212-403-2000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5698987. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CHARLES KURZMAN (Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-2010MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Claire E. Addis, :Firm- Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - 212-403-1000. Fax No. - 212-403-2000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5698998. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CHARLES KURZMAN (Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 9 , 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. Jonathan M. Moses and Claire E. Addis may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2018. For the reasons stated on the record, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 10/19/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following briefing schedule shall govern: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before December 7, 2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before January 11, 2019; Defendant shall file a reply/opposition on or before February 8, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before March 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/19/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-1912ENTERED IN ERROR.....PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; (See docket entry no. 11 to view. (ztd) Modified on 10/23/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 12/7/2018; Plaintiff shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 1/11/2019; Defendant shall file a reply/opposition on or before 2/8/2019; and Plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 3/8/2019. (kt) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-12-0713MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-01-0814MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tamara Livshiz, :Firm- Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street. Phone No. - 212 403-1152. Fax No. - 212 403-2000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5877215. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CHARLES KURZMAN (Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-1115Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CHARLES KURZMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kurzman, # 2 Declaration Patel, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1116Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CHARLES KURZMAN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kurzman, # 2 Declaration Patel, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolinsky, Marc) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, Dkt. 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Tamara Livshiz may appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-02-0817Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, Dkt. 17, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a combined reply in support of Defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/10/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/10/2019)
2019-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a combined reply in support of Defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 2/15/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1218ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant's notice of errata, Dkt. 18, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before February 15, 2019; and Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Summary Judgement shall be due on or before March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/14/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar