Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01862
Date Filed2018-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning an October 2016 briefing with reporters at the State Department. Citizens United also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5627824) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons to State Dept, # 6 Summons to Attorney General, # 7 Summons to U.S. Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-082LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-093STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/9/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-255NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/25/2018)
2018-09-196ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on October 25, 2018, at 10:15 a.m., in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss the status of the Department's search and scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/25/2018, at 10:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-047Consent MOTION to Continue the October 25, 2018, Status Conference by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to continue, Dkt. 7 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference scheduled for October 25, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED to October 29, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/4/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-05Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 10/25/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 10/29/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/29/2018. Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-12-038Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/3/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar