Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01873
Date Filed2018-08-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffIN HO CHO
Case DescriptionIn Ho Cho, a South Korean businessman, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning his visa applications. Cho had invested $500,000 in the U.S. and then applied for visas for him, his wife and his daughter based on that investment. The State Department rejected his visa application because it conflicted with an earlier visa application that had been prepared for Cho by a South Korean travel agent. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cho filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Discovery, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5630525) filed by IN HO CHO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. State Department)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-092NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by IN HO CHO. Case related to Case No. 18-1875. (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-093MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Asa Hutchinson, III, :Firm- Asa Hutchinson, :Address- THE ASA HUTCHINSON LAW GROUP, PLC. Phone No. - 4798781600. Fax No. - 4798768283 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5630603. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IN HO CHO (Wright, Jason) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-104SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), an attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice before this Court must file a motion signed by a sponsoring member of the Bar of this Court, accompanied by a declaration by the non-member attorney setting forth the information required in the Rule. The pro hac motion at issue here does not comply with Local Rule 83.2(d) because, while the motion appears to contain the information required by that Rule, the information is not set forth in a declaration by the non-member attorney. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 19, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-12-135ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/13/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 1/14/2019. (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2019-01-146RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by IN HO CHO re 5 Order to Show Cause . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Jason) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER discharging 5 Order to show cause. It is hereby ORDERED that the government shall respond to the complaint within the period of time allowed by the Federal Rules. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/31/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-117Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time: it is hereby ORDERED that that Defendant shall file its Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's complaint on or before March 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/12/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar