Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting, et al., v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv04852
Date Filed2018-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffAaron Sankin
Case DescriptionCenter for Investigative Reporting reporter Aaron Sankin submitted two FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning reports pertaining to extremist activity on 4chan. CIR also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided 18 pages of previously released records in response to Sankin's first request and told Sankin that more responsive records might exist. Sankin filed an administrative appeal of that decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Sankin and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-101COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12585746.). Filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, et al., (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-102Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-103Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-104Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/24/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-10Electronic filing error . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) Plaintif f Party Sankin was not entered. Plaintiff & Defendant Parties Entered Incorrectly. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-105Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/10/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-136Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-137CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-218CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Sankin, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-239CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 11/6/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Case Management Statement is now due by 10/30/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-1810ANSWER to 1 Complaint ; by United States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 9/18/2018) Modified on 9/19/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1611CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2018. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1712ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1713ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1714ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1715CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice.. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2018) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-3116STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Aaron Sankin, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-0117STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 16 Stipulation.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-2618JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (Saltiel, Steven) (Filed on 11/26/2018) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-0419Minute Entry for case management conference held on 12/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A further case management conference is set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 am. An updated joint case management statement is due by 3/12/2019. The deadline to add new parties or amend the pleadings is 12/31/2018. FTR Time: 10:26 - 10:28 Plaintiff Attorney: Victoria Baranetsky Defendant Attorney: Steven Saltiel (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0520PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/4/2018 10:26:01 AM ]. File Size [ 1192 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:29 ]. (courtspeak). (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2019-03-1221JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 3/12/2019) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-1222ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 12, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-04-2323JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Justice. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-2624CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the case management conference is rescheduled to 6/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. An updated Case Management Statement is due by 6/18/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-06-0525STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 6/5/2019) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0626ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 25 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-07-1527STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. (Reagin, Julie) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1928ORDER granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 27 Stipulation.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-1229NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/12/2019) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-1330STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Status Report and Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/13/2019) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-1431ORDER granting Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 30 Stipulation.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-09-2032STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 9/20/2019) (Entered: 09/20/2019)
2019-09-2333ORDER granting Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 32 Stipulation.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-2534STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-2835Order, signed as modified on 10/28/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 34 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-2836ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by the Clerk on 10/28/2019. (ecgS COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-10-28Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Judge Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-2237STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-2238Order, signed 11/22/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 37 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2020-01-0939JOINT Status Report and Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference and Proposed Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/09/2020)
2020-01-1340Order, signed 1/13/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 39 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Status Report due by 3/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-3041NOTICE of Change of Address by Emmet P. Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-02-0342ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse in the San Francisco division. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials AGT immediately after the case number. All hearings and motions remain as scheduled. Existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Signed by the Clerk on 2/3/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-03Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Alex G Tse. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (ecgS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-0543ORDER of Recusal by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-0644ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G Tse no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 2.6.20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-0645CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. DISREGARD ENTRY : CLERICAL ERROR You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020) Modified on 2/7/2020 (as, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-0746CORRECTED ORDER:ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/20. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-03-0547JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/5/2020) Modified on 3/6/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This date was terminated when the case was erroneously reassigned to Judge Beeler. This temporarily restores the matter on Judge Spero's calendar, pending the stipulation for continuance. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0948Order, signed 3/6/2020. by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 47 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Status Report due by 5/29/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-3149STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY OF PROCESSING AND PRODUCTION SCHEDULE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/31/2020) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-3150Order, signed 3/31/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 49 Stipulation REGARDING TEMPORARY STAY OF PROCESSING AND PRODUCTION SCHEDULE(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-05-2851JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-2952Order, signed 5/29/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 51 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. Status Report due by 7/24/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-07-2253CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) ,. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2020 02:00 PM WILL BE BY ZOOM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than July 27, 2020 by 3:00 PM PDT. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619260804?pwd=RE5qWDhGOTdWWTZUOFlOKzhNc3pjZz09 Meeting ID: 161 926 0804 Password: 050855 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.go v/zoom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-2354JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-2455ORDER GRANTING re 54 Joint Case Management Statement/Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than September 18, 2020 by 3:00 PM PDt. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619260804?pwd=RE5qWDhGOTdWWTZUOFlOKzhNc3pjZz09 Meeting ID: 161 926 0804 Password: 050855 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/24/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-09-1756JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-1757ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 12/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs Court Appearances: Ad vanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at jcscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 12/2/2020 by 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/17/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-11-2458STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 11/24/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-3059Order, signed 11/30/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 58 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.This will be held by Zoom Webinar. Please see Judge Spero's webpage for Zoom information. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2021-01-2260JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-01-2261ORDER, signed 1/22/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, GRANTING re 60 Joint Case Management Statement & Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-03-0562JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/5/2021) (Entered: 03/05/2021)
2021-03-0863ORDER. Signed 3/8/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero GRANTING re 62 Joint Case Management Statement/Request for Continuance filed by United States Department of Justice. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing , recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-04-1264JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Justice. (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar