Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTABOR v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01879
Date Filed2018-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDAMON TABOR
Case DescriptionReporter Damon Tabor submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for agency records concerning the death of agency employee Jerrold Daniels in 1982. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tabor filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5632946) filed by Damon Tabor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - FOIA Response, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-102NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of Damon Tabor (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-144STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 14, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-255NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/25/2018)
2018-09-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/22/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/21/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-209ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, the parties to file, by November 19, 2018, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to resolve any remaining issues in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 4, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-11-1611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 19, 2018, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 19, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 18, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 19, 2018. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. (tg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-01-1813MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the defendant's 13 Motion for Stay of All Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, the deadline set forth in the Court's December 19, 2018 Minute Order, and ORDERING that the parties file, within seven days of Congress appropriating funds for the defendant, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 18, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-02-0114Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 7, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2019. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar