Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRoyal v. City of Atlanta et al
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv03820
Date Filed2018-08-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Totenberg
PlaintiffJohn C. Royal
Case DescriptionJohn Royal filed suit against the City of Atlanta for failing to respond to his Open Records Act request. The complaint also names the Department of Housing and Urban Development as a defendant, but does not indicate that Royal requested records from that federal agency. This is an access claim, but not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantCity of Atlanta
DefendantU.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-101APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John C. Royal. (Attachments: # 1 Request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-13Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ddm) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-152ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to send plaintiff a new application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon plaintiff's filing of a new application to proceed in forma pauperis or the expiration of 14 days from the date of this Order, whichever first occurs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/15/2018. (jtj) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-15Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John C. Royal re 2 Order and IFP application. (jtj) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-273APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John C. Royal. (jtj) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29Submission of 3 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (jtj) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-304ORDER GRANTING 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, it is further ORDERED that service of process shall not issue at thepresent time, and the Clerk shall submit this file to the assigned district judge for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 8/30/2018. (btql) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-305COMPLAINT (Request for Documents) filed by John C. Royal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-30Submission of 5 Complaint to District Judge Amy Totenberg for frivolity review. (btql) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-30Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to John C. Royal re 4 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (btql) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar