Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePicardi v. U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre et al
DistrictDistrict of South Dakota
CityCentral Division
Case Number3:2018cv03014
Date Filed2018-08-13
Date Closed2021-12-16
JudgeU.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange
PlaintiffEdward J.S. Picardi, M.D.
Case DescriptionEdward Picardi submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for U.S Attorneys for records concerning himself. After the agency failed to respond, Picardi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre SD Dept. of Justice
DefendantU.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City SD Dept. of Justice
DefendantU.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls SD Dept. of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [59]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-131COMPLAINT filed by Edward J.S. Picardi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Edward J.S. Picardi, MD) (SAC) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-132CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SAC) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-133Filing Fee Received from Edward J.S. Picardi. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003008. (SAC) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-134MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Edward J.S. Picardi will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SAC) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-206RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendants U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter dated 8-14-18, # 2 Envelope postmarked 8-16-18)(JLS) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-215ORDER granting 4 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. The Clerks Office shall arrange to train the pro se filer on how to e-file documents and issue the pro se filer a CM/ECF login and password after the training is completed. The ability of the pro se filer to e-file documents may be revoked anytime the Court deems it justified. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 8/21/18. (SKK) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-12-277FILED IN ERROR: First MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Picardi, Edward) Modified text on 12/28/2018 (SST). (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-28NOTICE of Filing Error: 7 Motion for Summary Judgment was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Picardi, Edward) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-288MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Exhibits) (Picardi, Edward) Modified text on 12/28/2018 (SST). (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-319ORDER giving Notice of Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Service of summons and complaint must be made by 1/18/19 or this case will be dismissed. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/31/18. (JLS) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-0210CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD . (Picardi, Edward) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0211Summons Issued as to USA. 2 original summons delivered via hand-delivery to plaintiff. A0 85 and Rule 73 memo previously delivered to plaintiff via hand-delivery. (SST) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-02-0712NOTICE of Appearance by SaraBeth Donovan on behalf of All Defendants. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-0713MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-1214ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/12/2019. (LH) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-0615Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-1516ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Answer due March 15, 2019. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 03/15/2019. (LH) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-1517ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-1718RESPONSE to 17 Answer to Complaint filed by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Picardi, Edward) (Entered: 03/17/2019)
2019-04-1819ORDER FOR RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/18/2019. (LH) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-2320MOTION to Extend Deadline by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. E-filed for Dr. Picardi per chambers. (SST) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-3021ORDER granting 20 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/30/2019. (LH) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-3122RETURN OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Subpoena for Documents)(Picardi, Edward) Modified on 6/4/2019 (SLT). (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-0323STATEMENT OF Undisputed MATERIAL FACTS re 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ) (Picardi, Edward) Modified on 6/4/2019 (SLT). (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-2424MOTION to Extend Deadlines by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2825MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2826MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2827STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS re 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2828DECLARATION of SaraBeth Donovan re 25 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10-cr-50092 Docket, # 2 Exhibit 2 - 10-cr-50092 Doc. 198, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 10-cr-50092 Doc. 45, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Standing Order 19-03, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 10-cr-50092 Doc. 265, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 8C 13-2041 Docket, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 13-cv-05035 Docket, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 15-cv-05050 Docket, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 8C 18-3234 Docket, # 10 Exhibit 10 - IPro screen shot) (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2829DECLARATION of Justin Wilkinson re 25 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - P's Req 02.19.14, # 2 Exhibit B - EOUSA Ltr 04.02.14, # 3 Exhibit C - P Req 04.20.14, # 4 Exhibit D - EOUSA Ltr 05.16.14, # 5 Exhibit E - OIP Ltr 07.25.14, # 6 Exhibit F - OIP Ltr 08.14.14, # 7 Exhibit G - P Req 05.09.14, # 8 Exhibit H - EOUSA Ltr 05.12.14, # 9 Exhibit I - P Req 06.10.14, # 10 Exhibit J - EOUSA Ltr 06.25.14, # 11 Exhibit K - OIP Ltr 08.27.14, # 12 Exhibit L - OIP Ltr 09.19.14, # 13 Exhibit M - EOUSA Ltr 10.27.14, # 14 Exhibit N - P Req 11.12.14, # 15 Exhibit O - OGIS Ltr 05.28.15, # 16 Exhibit P - EOUSA Ltr 09.25.15, # 17 Exhibit Q - OIP Ltr 10.21.15, # 18 Exhibit R - EOUSA Ltr 04.20.17, # 19 Exhibit S - Env 05.12.17, # 20 Exhibit T - OIP Ltr 03.09.18, # 21 Exhibit U - OIP Ltr 09.13.19, # 22 Exhibit V - P Req 07.30.14, # 23 Exhibit W - EOUSA Ltr 08.15.14, # 24 Exhibit X - EOUSA Ltr 03.15.16, # 25 Exhibit Y - EOUSA Ltr 09.06.18, # 26 Exhibit Z - P Ltr 09.22.18, # 27 Exhibit AA - EOUSA Ltr 06.26.19) (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2830DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF Disputed MATERIAL FACTS re 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Donovan, SaraBeth) Modified on 7/1/2019 (SLT). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2931ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Defendant's Filing Deadline. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 6/29/19. (Lange, Roberto) (Entered: 06/29/2019)
2019-07-1032RESPONSE to 25 Motion filed by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ALL DOCUMENT submission Payment to EUOSA) (Picardi, Edward) Modified link on 7/25/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-2433REPLY to Motion Response re: 25 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Donovan, SaraBeth) Modified links on 7/25/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-2434Supplemental DECLARATION of Justin Wilkinson re 25 Motion for Summary Judgment . (Donovan, SaraBeth) Modified on 7/25/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-3035STATUS REPORT by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-08-1336Memorandum in Opposition re: 25 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified mailing receipt, # 2 Exhibit Trial transcript re Zimmiond, # 3 Exhibit Hearing transcript re Zimmiond, # 4 Exhibit Trial Transcript re Kohn) (Picardi, Edward) Modified on 8/14/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-09-3037ORDER denying 8 & 25 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/30/2019. (KLE) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-12-2838First MOTION to Unseal Document Grand Jury Transcripts by Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Donation List) (Picardi, Edward) (Entered: 12/28/2019)
2020-01-1739MOTION to Seal Document by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Attachments: # 1 Defendant's Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Material, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Disclosure of Grand Jury Material, # 3 Defendant's Memorandum Brief in Support of Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Material) (KLE) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-1740MOTION to Extend re 38 First MOTION to Unseal Document Grand Jury Transcripts by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Donovan, SaraBeth) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-02-1241ORDER on Pending Motions Concerning Grand Jury Material denying 38 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting 39 Motion to Seal Document; denying as moot 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 02/12/2020. (KLE) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-1242SEALED Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Material Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 6(e). (KLE) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-1243SEALED Memorandum Brief in Support of Petition for Disclosure of Grand Jury Material 42 . (KLE) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-04-3044Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney as to U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. Attorney Alison J. Ramsdell added. Attorney SaraBeth Donovan terminated. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-08-1245NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of All Defendants. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2021-06-0846ORDER CONCERNING POSSIBLE DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 06/08/2021. (LH) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-1047MOTION TO COMPEL/REQUEST for Not to Dismiss/REQUEST to Correct Error in Record by Plaintiff Edward J.S. Picardi, MD re 46 Order (Picardi, Edward) Modified to change event type to Motion on 6/11/2021 (DJP). (Entered: 06/10/2021)
2021-06-2948STATUS REPORT by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-06-2949DECLARATION of Justin P. Wilkinson re 48 Status Report (Second Supplemental) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-EOUSA's First Interim Response, # 2 Exhibit B-EOUSA's Second Interim Response, # 3 Exhibit C-EOUSA's Third Interim Response, # 4 Exhibit D-EOUSA's Fourth Interim Response, # 5 Exhibit E-EOUSA's Fifth Interim Response, # 6 Exhibit F-EOUSA's Sixth Interim Response, # 7 Exhibit G-EOUSA's Seventh Interim Response, # 8 Exhibit H-EOUSA's Eighth Interim Response, # 9 Exhibit I-EOUSA's Ninth Interim Response, # 10 Exhibit J-EOUSA's Tenth Interim Response) (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-09-0150ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Plaintiff's Motions Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on September 1, 2021. (DLC) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-1551REQUEST for Not to Dismiss;Court Order Requesting Compliance with FOIA Request by Plaintiff Edward J.S. Picardi, MD re 50 Order on Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Surveillance, # 2 Exhibit B - Surveillance, # 3 Exhibit C - Surveillance, # 4 Exhibit D - Surveillance, # 5 Exhibit E - Surveillance, # 6 Exhibit F - Surveillance, # 7 Exhibit G - Surveillance, # 8 Exhibit H - Surveillance, # 9 Exhibit I - Surveillance) (Picardi, Edward) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-2252Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2253MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by All Defendants. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2254STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS re 52 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2255DECLARATION of Justin P. Wilkinson re 52 Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Vaughn Index, # 2 Exhibit B-EOUSA's Eleventh Interim Response, # 3 Exhibit C-EOUSA's Twelfth Interim Response) (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2256DECLARATION of SaraBeth Donovan re 52 Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Picardi's Email re Exclusionary Terms) (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2257DECLARATION of Debbie Gilman re 52 Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2258DECLARATION of Jean Marie Carlson re 52 Second MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Ramsdell, Alison) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-12-1659OPINION AND ORDER granting 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/16/21. (SKK) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-1660SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Attorney's Offices, Pierre, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Rapid City, U.S. Attorney's Offices, Sioux Falls against Edward J.S. Picardi, MD. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/16/21. (SKK) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar