Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKopp v. United States Secret Service
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv04913
Date Filed2018-08-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffQuentin L. Kopp
Case DescriptionQuentin Kopp, a former California State Senator, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning the number of employees that accompanied Donald Trump, Jr. on his trip to India and the costs incurred. The agency told Kopp that his request was too broad and that he should narrow the scope of the request. Kopp sent a letter to the agency arguing that his request was not too broad. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Kopp filed suit.
Complaint issues: Request - Specificity, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Secret Service
DefendantTHE UNITED STATES SECRET SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-141COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Injunctive Relief Under The Freedom of Information Act against United States Secret Service (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12592004.). Filed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/14/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-142Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-213Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-214Summons Issued as to United States Secret Service. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-285CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Quentin L. Kopp.. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/28/2018) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-296SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quentin L. Kopp. United States Secret Service served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-297SUMMONS Returned Executed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-248NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Hunt (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-249ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Secret Service. (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 9/24/2018) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-2510CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-0911CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Secret Service.. (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/9/2018) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-3012ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-3113ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3114ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3115REQUEST for ADR Phone Conference (Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 10/31/2018) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-0116ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, November 13, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0917JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Quentin L. Kopp. (Barr, Mallory) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1318ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference set for 11/13/2018, HAS BEEN RESCHEDULED to 11/14/2018, at 11:30 AM Pacific time. The call-in information remains the same. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1419CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for 11/16/18 at 2:00 PM, has been re-set for 1/18/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Any party seeking a continuance shall e-file a stipulation and proposed order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1420ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 11/14/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2019-01-0721MOTION to Stay re 19 Clerk's Notice,, (Unopposed) filed by United States Secret Service. Responses due by 1/22/2019. Replies due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hunt, Laura) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0822ORDER, signed as modified on 1/8/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part 21 Motion to Stay Deadlines for the Case Management Statement and Case Management Conference in Light of the Lapse of Appropriations. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar