Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5642152) filed by LEN SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA to FBI 4.9.2018, # 2 Exhibit FBI denial because it cannot search, # 3 Exhibit Stamboulieh, Stephen, AP-2018-004282, FBI - Affirm, # 4 Exhibit Fbi Denial for Las Vegas Shooting, # 5 Exhibit Appeal to FBI 5.22.2018, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-15 | 2 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by LEN SAVAGE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by LEN SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Summons proposed summons, # 2 Summons proposed summons)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 08/15/2018) |
2018-08-16 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 08/16/2018) |
2018-08-17 | 3 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/17/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/17/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-28 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/27/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/27/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/26/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return on Civil Process Clerk US Attorney, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service on Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Return on US Attorney General, # 4 Exhibit Proof of Service on FBI, # 5 Exhibit Return on FBI, # 6 Exhibit Receipt with tracking numbers and payment)(Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | 8 | ORDER directing the parties to file a Joint Status Report by October 26, 2018. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/26/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-09-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 09/26/2018) |
2018-10-26 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 10/26/2018) |
2018-10-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 9 Joint Status Report, parties are ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before December 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 10/29/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/29/2018) |
2018-10-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 10/29/2018) |
2018-12-14 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/14/2018) |
2018-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 10 Joint Status Report, parties are ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before January 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/17/2018) |
2018-12-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 12/17/2018) |
2019-01-17 | 11 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2019) |
2019-01-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay. Upon considering the Defendant's 11 Motion to Stay, it is hereby ordered that this matter shall be stayed until Congress has restored appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is further ordered that the Defendant will notify the Court immediately upon resumption of appropriations. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/18/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/18/2019) |
2019-01-28 | 12 | NOTICE of Restored Government Funding by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court hereby lifts the stay in this case. The parties are further ORDERED to file a further status report on or before February 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/28/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-01-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 01/28/2019) |
2019-02-04 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 02/04/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 Joint Status Report, parties are ORDERED to file a further joint status report on or before March 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 2/5/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-02-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/05/2019) |
2019-03-15 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 03/15/2019) |
2019-03-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Tuesday, April 9, 2019 at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/18/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-03-18 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 03/18/2019) |
2019-04-09 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trevor N. McFadden: Status Conference held on 4/9/2019. The Court directs the Federal Bureau of Investigation to make a monthly production. The Court further Orders a Joint Status Report to be filed on or about the first day of every third month beginning on 7/1/2019. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller.) (hmc) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-04-09 | 15 | NOTICE of Number of Pages of Potentially Responsive Records by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 04/09/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-09-04 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 09/04/2019) |
2019-10-01 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 10/01/2019) |
2019-10-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on or before November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/3/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-10-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/03/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a Status Conference on December 10, 2019, at 10 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before December 6, 2019, addressing the status of settlement negotiations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/8/19. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2019; Status Conference scheduled for 12/10/2019, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (tg) (Entered: 11/12/2019) |
2019-11-27 | 20 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michelle D. Jackson on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Denise M. Clark (Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-05 | 21 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LEN SAVAGE (Stamboulieh, Stephen) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
2019-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice per the terms of the stipulation. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/05/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/05/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |