Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJURDI v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01892
Date Filed2018-08-13
Date Closed2020-09-02
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJAY JURDI
Case DescriptionJay Jurdi, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration and the FBI for records concerning Anthony Grasso, a confidential informant for the agency who testified at Jurdi's trial. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Jurdi filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy, which upheld the Glomar response from both agencies. Jurdi then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Determination - Glomar response

DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [26]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-13Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/13/18. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by JAY JURDI. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(zsth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAY JURDI (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(zsth) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-223PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/21/2018. (zsth) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-064Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to JAY JURDI; Type of Document Returned: Docket Sheet; Resent at New Address: UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY - BEAUMONT P.O. Box 26030 Beaumont, TX 77720 (zrdj) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-065Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Sent to JAY JURDI; Type of Document Returned: 3 PRO SE ORDER; Resent at New Address: UNITED STATES PENITENTIARY - BEAUMONT P.O. Box 26030 Beaumont, TX 77720 (zrdj) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-20Filing fee received in the amount of $ 350.00, receipt number: 4616094639. (zmd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-176AFFIDAVIT of Service by JAY JURDI. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2019-01-257MOTION for Entry of Default by JAY JURDI (zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-28Case Reassigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-018ORDER denying 7 Motion for Entry of Default. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/1/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-03-28SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-269NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-05-1010First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 10 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including June 14, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/10/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/14/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-06-1211MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-12MINUTE ORDER granting 11 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including August 13, 2019 to file its answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/12/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/13/2019. (tj) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-08-1212MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-12MINUTE ORDER granting 12 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including September 12, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/12/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
2019-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/12/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-09-1213MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration FBI, # 4 Declaration DEA, # 5 Exhibit DEA Declartion Exhibit, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-1614Order advising plaintiff to respond by 10/18/2019 to 13 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, and defendant to file its reply by 11/8/19. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/16/19. (ms) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-1615Letter from Jay Jurdi. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/16/2019. (ztth) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-10-2416MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAY JURDI. (ztth) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/1/2019) (ztth). (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/1/2019) (ztth); Modified to remove blank pages on 11/1/2019 (ztth). (Entered: 10/29/2019)
2019-10-30MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 16 is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendant shall serve a copy of its Motion for Summary Judgment 13 on plaintiff at his current address of record by November 8, 2019; plaintiff shall file his opposition by December 6, 2019; and defendant shall file its reply by December 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/19. (ms) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/8/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/6/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/27/2019. (tj) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-12-0217Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAY JURDI. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts - Undisputed, # 2 Statement of Facts - Disputed, # 3 Declaration) (ztth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-0218MOTION for Summary Judgment by JAY JURDI. (See Docket Entry 17 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-2719NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)
2019-12-2720RESPONSE re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)
2019-12-2721REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Chang, William) (Entered: 12/27/2019)
2020-01-1322MOTION to treat his allegations as admitted re 1 Complaint, MOTION to Strike 20 Response to motion by JAY JURDI. (ztth) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-1623SURREPLY to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JAY JURDI. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/16/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-01-2824Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION to treat his allegations as admitted re 1 Complaint MOTION to Strike 20 Response to motion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
2020-09-0225ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 18 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Treat Allegations as Admitted. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/2/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-0226MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 13 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 18 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and denying 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Treat Allegations as Admitted. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/2/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar