Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-08-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5644820) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/16/2018) |
2018-08-16 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 08/20/2018) |
2018-08-21 | | SUMMONS Not Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-21 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2018) |
2018-08-24 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 08/24/2018) |
2018-09-14 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/6/2018. (Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018) |
2018-09-14 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/10/2018 (Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018) |
2018-09-14 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/05/2018. (Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 09/14/2018) |
2018-10-05 | 8 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/05/2018) |
2018-10-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/7/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/07/2018) |
2018-10-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/11/2018) |
2018-10-18 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney April Seabrook (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/18/2018) |
2018-11-08 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/08/2018) |
2018-11-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 12/21/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/8/18. (DJS) (Entered: 11/08/2018) |
2018-11-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (tb) (Entered: 11/09/2018) |
2018-11-27 | 11 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (joint) by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-11-27 | 12 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/271/8. (DJS) (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
Hide Docket Events |