Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv07489
Date Filed2018-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications between the agency and outside parties pertaining to the pesticide TCVP since June 2016. NRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NRDC that responding to the request would not incur fees. The agency told NRDC that it was processing its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-161COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15462160)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-163REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-164RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc..(Marks, Nancy) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nancy Sharman Marks. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Environmental Protection Agency. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-175ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-176MOTION for Ian Fein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15466044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Afffidavit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Fein, Ian) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Ian Fein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15466044. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-217ORDER granting 6 Motion for Ian Fein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar