Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSingh et al v. U.S. Department of State et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01210
Date Filed2018-08-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas S. Zilly
PlaintiffGurnek Singh
PlaintiffPawan Deep Kaur
Case DescriptionGurnek Singh and Pawan Deep Kaur submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning an I-130 Petition for an Alien Relative filed by Singh in 2010 on behalf of his wife and why the petition was denied in 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Singh and Kaur filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of State
DefendantMichael R. Pompeo in his official capacity as Secretary of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-161SEALED DOCUMENT COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5437757), filed by Gurnek Singh and Pawan Deep Kaur. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edward, Carol) Modified on 8/20/2018 at the request of finance to correct the case number. (ST) Modified on 8/20/2018 to seal Complaint; document contains identifiers that must be redacted per FRCP 5.2 (full last name of minor child) (KB). (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-20Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-202Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Department of State (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. The exhibits attached to the complaint contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. Specifically, the pictures of the minor child on pages 3, 8 and 9 must be redacted as well as the personal identifier on page 25. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event " Redacted Document " located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-203NOTICE TO FILER: re 1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-204REDACTION to 1 Complaint Notice to Filer , by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/21/2018 (SWT). (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-215REDACTION to 1 Complaint 4 Redacted Document, 3 Notice to Filer, Notice to Filer ,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) Modified docket entry relationship on 8/22/2018 (SWT). (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-236REDACTION to 1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Gurnek Singh (Edward, Carol) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-057ORDER setting deadline for parties to file a Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar