Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01950
Date Filed2018-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for emails from paralegal Allison Hrabar containing the keywords "Trump," "Trumptard," or "socialist." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred it to the Antitrust Division. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5648815) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-21Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-234ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/23/18. (DM) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/4/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/4/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-226NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
2018-09-227MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
2018-09-238Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/23/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, and Plaintiff's 8 Opposition to Defendant's Request to Extend Time to File Answer. Defendant requests an extension from October 4, 2018, until November 19, 2018, to file its answer, in part due to its counsel's "long-planned" vacation during early October. Despite Plaintiff's opposition, the Court shall GRANT Defendant's 7 Motion, for good cause shown. In order to mitigate the effects of this extension, the Court expects that Defendant will be making efforts to process Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") request in the interim. Defendant's answer, or a separate, concurrent filing, shall indicate the current status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, including its position in Defendant's FOIA queue and how long Defendant expects to require to process that request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 24, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/19/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-11-199ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1910STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-2811ORDER. The parties shall file the schedule not later than JANUARY 4, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 28, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Schedule due by 1/4/2019. (dot) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-2612MOTION to Stay All Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant Department of Justice's 12 Motion for a Stay of All Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. With Plaintiff's consent, and in an exercise of the Court's discretion, the Court shall GRANT Defendant's 12 Motion. The Court shall STAY the deadline for the Joint Status Report otherwise due by January 4, 2019. The deadline is tolled commensurate with the length of the lapse of appropriations to the U.S. Department of Justice. The parties shall file a notice within two business days of the restoration of the Department's funding and the resumption of its operations. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 27, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-2913NOTICE of Restored Funding by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendant's 13 Notice of Restored Government Funding. Accordingly, the Court hereby LIFTS the stay in this matter. The parties' next Joint Status Report shall be submitted by FEBRUARY 8, 2019 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 30, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-0814Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, which indicates that Defendant has completed its processing, has made its first release, and expects to make another release shortly. Accordingly, the Court shall adopt the parties' proposal that they file a further Joint Status Report by MARCH 7, 2019 , indicating whether any issues remain and proposing a schedule for any further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 12, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2019, indicating whether any issues remain and proposing a schedule for any further proceedings. (dot) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar