Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGoldschmidt v. United States Department of Education
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv05666
Date Filed2018-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Marvin E. Aspen
PlaintiffJona Goldschmidt
Case DescriptionJona Goldschmidt, a professor in the Department of Criminal Justice and Criminology at Loyola University Chicago, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for an Excel spreadsheet of 4-year colleges subject to the Clery Act and the email addresses of the schools' Clery Act reporting officers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Goldschmidt that it had no responsive records because such records were not collected by the agency. Further, it claimed that making such a spreadsheet would require the agency to create a record. Goldschmidt filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency told him that the information was available on its website. After Goldschmidt was unable to locate such a list on the agency's website, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-201COMPLAINT filed by Jona Goldschmidt; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14844485. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5)(Manchel, Brett) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-202ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jona Goldschmidt by Brett Adam Manchel (Manchel, Brett) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-203CIVIL Cover Sheet (Manchel, Brett) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-21CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (jjr, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-224MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing set for 12/6/2018 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-10-185DESIGNATION of Susan Willoughby Anderson as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States Department of Education (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-186ANSWER to Complaint by United States Department of Education(Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-12-067MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing held. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 2/4/2019. Responses are due by 3/7/2019; replies by 4/4/2019. Status hearing is set for 5/9/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-268GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2019-01-089AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-2810GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar