Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJACKSON & MACNICHOL et al v. WILKIE
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2018cv00324
Date Filed2018-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR
PlaintiffJACKSON & MACNICHOL
PlaintiffALEXANDRA M JACKSON
PlaintiffJORDAN L ZORETIC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Jackson & MacNichol submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs for the claims files of four of their clients. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Injunction

DefendantROBERT WILKIE Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-201COMPLAINT against ROBERT WILKIE with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by JACKSON & MACNICHOL, ALEXANDRA M JACKSON, JORDAN L ZORETIC. (Service of Process Deadline 11/19/2018) Fee due by 8/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 2/9/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI, # 2 Exhibit 2 fax copy of 2/9/17 letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 3/13/18 letter to Mr. Hooper, # 4 Exhibit 4 fax copy of 2/11/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Bruce Hooper, # 5 Exhibit 5 fax copy of 3/21/18 response letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals, # 6 Exhibit 6 6/2/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Charlie Wilder, # 7 Exhibit 7 fax copy of 6/2/17 letter, # 8 Exhibit 8 2/7/18 letter to Mr. Wilder, # 9 Exhibit 9 fax copy of 4/30/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Charlie Wilder, # 10 Exhibit 10 9/14/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Calvin McCune, # 11 Exhibit 11 fax copy of 9/14/17 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs - WI re: Calvin McCune, # 12 Exhibit 12 2/5/18 letter to Mr. McCune, # 13 Exhibit 13 fax copy of 6/29/18 letter to Board of Veterans' Appeals re: Calvin McCune, # 14 Exhibit 14 6/5/18 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs re: Stanley Kressin, # 15 Exhibit 15 fax copy of 6/5/18 letter to Department of Veterans Affairs re: Stanley Kressin, # 16 Exhibit 16 6/26/18 letter to Stanley Kressin, # 17 Exhibit 17 6/27/18 letter to Mr. Kressin)(bfa) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-202CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1888103.), filed by JACKSON & MACNICHOL.(JACKSON, FRANCIS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-203Summons Issued as to ROBERT WILKIE. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Attorney summons, # 2 Attorney General summons)(bfa) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-064AFFIDAVIT of Service by JACKSON & MACNICHOL, ALEXANDRA M JACKSON, JORDAN L ZORETIC. ROBERT WILKIE served on 8/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(JACKSON, FRANCIS) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-06Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for ROBERT WILKIE : Answer due by 9/21/2018. (sfw) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar