Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLarsen v. Transportation Security Administration
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv02132
Date Filed2018-08-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Raymond P. Moore
PlaintiffJared Larsen
Case DescriptionJared Larsen submitted a FOIA request to the Transportation Security Administration for records concerning an incident that occurred June 3, 2018 at Phoenix Sky Harbor airport and TSA's policies and procedures. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Larsen contacted the agency several times to check on the status of his request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Larsen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantTransportation Security Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-211COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Transportation Security Administration (TSA) (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6259368)Attorney Jared Douglas Larsen added to party Jared Larsen(pty:pla), filed by Jared Larsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Summons, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Larsen, Jared) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-212Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-214ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: 1 Complaint, filed by Jared D. Larsen. Pro se Plaintiff has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (evana, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-223SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-275MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-276CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02132-RM. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-047ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/4/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-048MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/4/2018. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar