Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01957
Date Filed2018-08-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed Reporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails sent to or from, and briefing books and other materials provided to, Secretary Kristjen Nielsen since June 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5651242) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - C, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-212NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-21Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/31/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/14/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-057NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-058ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by October 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/9/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/23/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-189NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-2310Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-25MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, the parties shall submit an updated joint status report on or before December 21, 2018, and every 60 days thereafter until production is complete. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-12-2111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2612NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-02-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-2814NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. Attorney Matthew Lynn Schafer terminated. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-2515LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-1916Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-06-1817Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-08-0618NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-10-1520Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-12-1621Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to appear for a status conference on January 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for January 20, 2020 is hereby CONTINUED to January 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER: The status conference currently scheduled for January 21, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper is hereby changed to a telephonic conference. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/17/19. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-18Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) (Entered: 12/18/2019)
2020-01-21Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/21/2020. Forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-1422Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-04-1423Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-06-1524Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-08-1425Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-10-1326Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-12-1427Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2021-02-1228Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-04-1329Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar