Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01975
Date Filed2018-08-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Protect Democracy Project submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning communications between White House staff and the agency mentioning Michael Cohen, Essential Consultants, or Novartis. PDP also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PDP's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-231COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5655662) filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney, # 6 Summons Defendant, # 7 Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1)(Berwick, Benjamin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/27/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-272LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.. (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-27Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3, # 3 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/10/2018. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/10/2018. (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 9/7/2018 (Berwick, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-097NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-098Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to October 9, 2018, that the Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/11/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-11-099ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES.(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar