Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01979
Date Filed2018-08-24
Date Closed2019-09-19
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for its Hillary Clinton investigative file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Judicial Watch that some records responsive to its request were available online in the FBI's FOIA Library. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [15]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5655885) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-243NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-2046. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-27Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-055ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/4/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/4/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in the correct case. (ztd) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/4/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/4/2018. (See docket entry 6 to view document.) (ztd) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-10-048MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A- Acknowledgment Letter, # 3 Exhibit B- Vault Letter, # 4 Exhibit C- January 2017 Joint Status Report, # 5 Exhibit D- First Status Conference, # 6 Exhibit E- Second Status Conference, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-179NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1710Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) Modified relief on 10/18/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Plaintiff's response due 10/25/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/2/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/25/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2511Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-3112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's reply due 11/5/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/1/18. (DJS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply due by 11/5/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0513REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Lopez-Morales, Cesar) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2019-07-2414NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James O. Bickford on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Cesar A. Lopez-Morales (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-09-1915MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendant's motion 8 to dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-1916ORDER granting Defendant's motion 8 to dismiss and directing the clerk of the court to close this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/2019. (lctsc1) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar