Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEpee v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2018cv02520
Date Filed2018-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Paul A. Magnuson
PlaintiffLeopold B. Epee on behalf of Bekele Asres Bogale
Case DescriptionLeopold Epee, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request on behalf of his client Bekeke Asres Bogale for his alien file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It located 646 pages. The agency disclosed 479 pages entirely and 53 pages in part. The agency withheld 108 pages under several exemptions. Epee filed an administrative appeal. The agency disclosed an additional 8 pages entirely and 22 pages in part. Epee then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [15]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-281COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6337659) filed by Leopold B. Epee. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Epee, Leopold) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-292TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2520 PAM/TNL. (MMG) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-293Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (MMG) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-064NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-065AFFIDAVIT of Service by Leopold B. Epee re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Epee, Leopold) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-066CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leopold B. Epee re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, (Epee, Leopold) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-10-037ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-048AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-239NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (HAM) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-1610REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Jointly Signed by Leopold B. Epee.(Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-0311Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/3/2018. Discussion of pretrial deadlines. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0412PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions (disp) due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/4/2018. (HAM) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2019-01-1013REQUEST for a Stay of the Entire Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1014PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for a Stay of the Entire Case in Light of Lapse of Appropriations 13 Request. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1115ORDER in Response to 13 Request. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/11/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-02-1416REQUEST Joint Request to Lift Stay by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-1417PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Request to Lift Stay 16 Request. (Brooker, Gregory) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-2518AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER in Response to 16 Joint Request to Lift Stay: (Motions (disp.) due by 8/1/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/25/2019. (JRE) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar