Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJordan v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CitySt. Joseph
Case Number5:2018cv06129
Date Filed2018-08-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Ortrie D. Smith
PlaintiffJack Jordan
Case DescriptionJack Jordan submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor for records concerning emails sent by employees of DynCorp International. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Jordan that his requests did not identify records that could be searched. Jordan then filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jordan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-291COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Labor Jack Jordan. Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO072576. Service due by 11/27/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-292NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director mailed to Plaintiff via USPS. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-10-033RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jack Jordan. U.S. Department of Labor served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-034RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jack Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney General)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-035Return of Service unexecuted by Jack Jordan as to U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration re Service on US Dept of Labor)(Jordan, Jack) Modified on 10/3/2018 to reflect Defendant's deadline to file answer or responsive pleading is October 1, 2018, pursuant to 5U.S.C. §552(a)(4)(C) (2000). Modified on 10/3/2018 (Matthes Mitra, Renea). (NEF regenerated.) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-106MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts & Supporting Suggestions, # 2 Declaration of Jack Jordan)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-127MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party U.S. Department of Labor(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-148SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jack Jordan 10/14/2018)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/14/2018)
2018-10-159REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1910RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 12/3/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/17/2018. Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-1911RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar