Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAddison County Sheriff's Department v. United States Office of Special Counsel
DistrictDistrict of Vermont
CityBurlington
Case Number2:2018cv00143
Date Filed2018-08-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christina Reiss
PlaintiffAddison County Sheriff's Department
Case DescriptionThe Addison County Sheriff's Department submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Office of Special Counsel for records of OSC's investigation into whether the sheriff's office had violated the Hatch Act. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Addison County Sheriff's Department filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Office of Special Counsel
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-311COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Office of Special Counsel filed by Addison County Sheriff's Department. Summonses issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pac) Text clarified on 8/31/2018 (law). (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-142SUMMONS Returned Executed. United States Office of Special Counsel served on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Summons as to United States of Special Counsel)(law) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-093ANSWER to Complaint by United States Office of Special Counsel.(Torti, Julia) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/9/2018) (jlh). (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-094NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: 3 Answer to Complaint filed by United States Office of Special Counsel. The document has been replaced to correct the information in the Certificate of Service. The corrected document is now attached to 3 as well as this entry. (jlh) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar