Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWood v. United States Department of the Army
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv01317
Date Filed2018-09-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Barbara J. Rothstein
PlaintiffArlyn Wood
Case DescriptionArlyn Wood submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Army for records concerning various incidents when he was in the Army. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing from the agency, Wood filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing more, Wood filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-071COMPLAINT for FOIA violation against defendant(s) United States Department of the Army (Receipt # 0981-5462763) Attorney Matthew Z Crotty added to party Arlyn Wood(pty:pla), filed by Arlyn Wood. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crotty, Matthew) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-11Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (ST) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-112Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) United States Department of the Army (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(ST) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-203SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States Department of the Army on 9/19/2018 (U.S. Attorney General on 9/11/2018; U.S. Dept. of the Army on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Crotty, Matthew) Modified on 9/21/2018 to include names of those served (PM). (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-274PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS Amended Summons to US Army by Plaintiff Arlyn Wood (Attachments: # 1 Summons Amended Summons)(Crotty, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-285Amended Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Department of the Army. (PM) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-096ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/6/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2018, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-097MINUTE ORDER: At the request of counsel, an extension of time to file the joint status report is granted. The report will be due on 12/20/2018. All other FRCP 26-related dates are adjusted accordingly. Failure to adhere to these deadlines may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-198NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant United States Department of the Army. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-199ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of the Army.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-0110STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for relief from discovery requirements by parties (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0211MINUTE ORDER: The Court having reviewed the parties' Stipulated Motion for Relief of 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report (Dkt. No. 10 ), HEREBY ORDERS that this case is exempt from the initial disclosure requirements of Rule 26(a)(1), as well as from the requirements of Rule 26(f). The Court further orders that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 29, 2019 in which the parties inform the Court of their progress on resolving this matter or, if necessary, propose a briefing schedule on Plaintiff's Freedom of Information Act requests. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SWT) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2019-01-1512Unopposed MOTION to Stay of Deadlines , filed by Defendant United States Department of the Army. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/15/2019, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-1613MINUTE ORDER: The United States Department of the Army's 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines is GRANTED. All pending deadlines are STAYED and EXTENDED commensurate with duration of the lapse in appropriations. The Government shall notify the Court once appropriations have been received. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-2914NOTICE of Appropriations Rec'd and Proposed Order re resetting deadline ; filed by Defendant United States Department of the Army. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-3015MINUTE ORDER re 14 Notice of Appropriations Rec'd and Proposed Order re resetting deadline . Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2019 now that government funding is restored. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-1516Joint STATUS REPORT and proposed Order by Defendant United States Department of the Army (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1917MINUTE ORDER: The parties request to extend the time to file a joint status report is granted. 16 Status Report filed by United States Department of the Army. An updated Joint Status Report is due on or before 3/18/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-1818Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant United States Department of the Army (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-1819ORDER directing the parties to file an updated status report by 5/17/2019. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar