Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02105
Date Filed2018-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for a search warrant issued to allow the agency to search emails on former Rep. Anthony Weiner's computer that might relate to the Hillary Clinton email investigation. The agency denied Judicial Watch's request. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of that decision. Judicial Watch submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's search of Weiner's computer. The agency acknowledged receipt of the second request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5680678) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-204RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/20/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 9/21/2018 to correct served/answer due date (jf). (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-265NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-10-186ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-197ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 19, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/19/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar