Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKaram v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityTucson Division
Case Number4:2018cv00454
Date Filed2018-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jennifer G Zipps
PlaintiffRose Ann Karam
Case DescriptionRose Ann Karam submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning her complaint to the Office of Civil Rights. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Karam filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-121COMPLAINT filed by Rose Ann Karam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-122APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rose Ann Karam. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-123MOTION to Include CD of Telephone Call by Rose Ann Karam. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-124MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Rose Ann Karam. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-125This case has been assigned to the Honorable Bernardo P Velasco. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-0454-TUC-BPV. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-126NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-127NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-128MINUTE ORDER: The Court's Notice 7 subjecting this case to the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) program is VACATED. This case will not be subject to the MIDP Pilot program requirements. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-189SCHEDULING ORDER (FOIA): Defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service, unless the Court otherwise directs for good cause shown. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is six (6) months from the date the case is filed. Failure to file such a motion shall result in dismissal for lack of prosecution. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 9/13/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-1810ORDER the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore is GRANTED. (Doc. 2 ). Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Electronic Filing is GRANTED. (Doc. 4 ). The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Include CD of Telephone Call is DENIED without prejudice. (Doc. 3 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 9/14/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2712Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-15Summons Issued in person at Customer Service Intake Counter as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (ARC). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-0713SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon U.S. Department of Health and Human Services on 10/22/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-0714SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon Attorney General of the United States on 10/23/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-0715SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rose Ann Karam: Certificate of Mailing upon Civil Process Clerk - United States Attorney's Office, District of Arizona on 10/22/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-2016STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-2117ORDER the Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead (First Request) is GRANTED. Defendant shall have until on or before 12/5/2018 to answer or otherwise plead in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 11/21/2018. (MFR) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-0418MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0619ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint . United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due December 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 12/6/2018.(BPV, bm) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-1220ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Health and Human Services.(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-1822Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-1823MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-00454-TUC-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2124First MOTION by Rose Ann Karam. (Karam, Rose Ann) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2125ORDER this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Velasco for all pretrialproceedings and report and recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-18-00454-TUC-JGZ (BPV). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 12/20/2018. (KEP) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2626MOTION to Stay Motion for Stay of Case Due to Federal Government Shutdown by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2727ORDER granting 26 Motion for Stay of Case Due to Federal Government Shutdown. The above-captioned case is STAYED pending the filing of a Notice of Resumed Government Activity by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 12/26/2018.(See attached Order for details) (KEP) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-02-0428NOTICE re: Resumed Government Activity by United States Department of Health and Human Services . (Hernandez, J) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-1229NOTICE re: Filing of Proposed Scheduling Order for Remainder of Litigation by United States Department of Health and Human Services re: 27 Order on Motion to Stay . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hernandez, J) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-1330ORDER the dispositive motion deadline be extended to April 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 2/13/2019. (KEP) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-2131ORDER denying 24 Motion to Reverse Random Assignment to District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 2/20/2019. (KEP) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-1532Remark: The Magistrate Judge referral in this case is directly reassigned by the Clerk to Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV-18-454-TUC-JGZ-DTF. All hearings currently scheduled in this case before Magistrate Judge Velasco, will proceed as scheduled before Judge Ferraro. Hearings not yet scheduled, shall be scheduled before the newly assigned Magistrate Judge.This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ADI-MLH, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar