Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02117
Date Filed2018-09-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Case DescriptionThe National Security Archive submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning former Deputy Secretary of State Strobe Talbott. The NSA also requested inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked NSA to narrow the scope of its request but later told NSA that the scope was narrow enough to allow a search. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-121COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5684203) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Rule 7.1 certificate, # 3 Summons Dep't of State, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-122LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (zmd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-12Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-10-104NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-185ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The schedule should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents the plaintiff requested, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, etc. The parties shall file the Joint Status Report no later than November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 19, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar