Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDiaz v. San Diego Police Department et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv05621
Date Filed2018-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Maxine M. Chesney
PlaintiffJuan Carlos Diaz, Sr. father on behalf of the family
DefendantSan Diego Police Department
DefendantCounty of San Diego
DefendantCounty of San Francisco
DefendantSan Mateo County
DefendantUC Davis School of Law
DefendantMaricopa County Phooenix Arizona
DefendantPima County Tucson Arizona
DefendantPena Nieto Administration in Mexico
DefendantCalifornia Superior Court System in San Diego
Defendant4th Court of Appeals San Diego California
DefendantFederal and State Agencies in Mexico in the State of Baja California
DefendantMexican Consulates with information
DefendantSan Francisco Mexican Consulate
DefendantSan Jose Mexican Consulate
DefendantSacramento Mexican Consulate
DefendantSan Diego Mexican Consulate
DefendantCommission Nacional de Derechos Humanos (CNDH)
DefendantInter American Commission of Human Rights
DefendantYahoo.com
DefendantHealth and Human Services Agency Region 9
DefendantUC Davis Psychology Department
DefendantUC Davis Physics Department
DefendantSan Francisco Unified
DefendantSan Mateo Unified
DefendantSan Diego Unified
DefendantWilson Unified School District Phoenix Arizona
DefendantTucson Unified (TUSD) Tucson Arizona
DefendantUmom Homeless Shelter in Phoenix Arizona
DefendantSeveral Homeless Shelters Sacramento, San Francisco, San Mateo, Santa Clarita, San Diego
DefendantSome Medical Institutions and Private Doctors in Phoenix Arizona Tucson AZ, San Diego, Chula Vista in Mexico
DefendantDepartment of Motor Vehicles Several Cities, States
DefendantDaly City Polce Department
DefendantAll District Attorneys involve and Supervisors in San Diego County and other Counties in California and Arizona
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security and or contractor performing X rays vehicles check on video in San Diego Border
DefendantDepartment of Rehabilitation in the State California and Arizona for Vocacional Employment
DefendantUS Postal Service US mail theft of court papers
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation Phoenix Arizona, San Diego California
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-133Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-174Order sealing 1 Complaint and 2 Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis should not be denied. Response due by October 9, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on September 17, 2018. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-055CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-116REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re denial of 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Objections due by October 25, 2018. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 11, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Complaint, # 2 Redacted Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2018: # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-117ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/11/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-128ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/12/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar