Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02125
Date Filed2018-09-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning a contract awarded by the Defense Washington Headquarters Services Office to Stefan Halper. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5686946) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-17Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-174STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/17/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-10-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/24/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-246ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 30, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2018, at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-257NOTICE of Appearance by Ramona Raula Cotca on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-308NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney April Seabrook (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-30Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2018. Rolling releases shall commence on 12/21/2018; Joint Status Report due by 12/11/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-12-119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 9, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before January 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/11/2018. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2019-01-2510Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to stay, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is ORDERED that the request for a stay is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/27/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 01/27/2019)
2019-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2019. (kt) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-18MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/18/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 02/18/2019)
2019-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2019. (kt) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar