Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWATERKEEPER ALLIANCE et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02135
Date Filed2018-09-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWATERKEEPER ALLIANCE
PlaintiffSIERRA CLUB
Case DescriptionWaterkeeper Alliance and the Sierra Club submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning policy changes pertaining to concentrated animal feeding operations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the requesters that fees would not be incurred. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Waterkeeper Alliance and the Sierra Club filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-141COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5689367) filed by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons to Wheeler, # 8 Summons to Sessions, # 9 Summons to Liu)(Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-142MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexis Andiman, :Firm- Earthjustice, :Address- 48 Wall Street, 15th Floor, New York, NY 10005. Phone No. - (212) 845-7376. Fax No. - (212) 918-1556 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5689382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SIERRA CLUB, WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexis Andiman, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-143Corporate Disclosure Statement by WATERKEEPER ALLIANCE. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-144Corporate Disclosure Statement by SIERRA CLUB. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-21ATTORNEY RENEWAL fee received: $ 25.00, online pay.gov receipt number: 0090-5699767. (zmd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-21Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-245MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave of Alexis Andiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/24/18. (DMK) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-246SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 9/28/2018 (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-088RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/01/2018. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2018. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 10/08/2018)
2018-10-1610NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02260-TJK. (Apfel, Carrie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-3111ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-3112ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before November 28, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/31/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-2813STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must submit another status report by January 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/29/2018. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-3114Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of the Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay. Defendant must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and propose a revised schedule for the production of documents and the filing of a status report, if necessary, at that time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-3015NOTICE of Resumption of Government Operations and Proposed Schedule by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's notice 15 , it is ORDERED that this Court's January 4, 2019 minute order granting a stay in this case is hereby lifted. Defendant must file a status report by February 15, 2019 that includes the plaintiffs' position on any proposed schedule. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/31/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-1516STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the defendant's status report 16 , it is ORDERED that defendant will review 1,000 documents a month and release the non-exempt portions in monthly productions. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant must submit a status report by May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/26/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar