Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCoalition for Humane Immigrant Rights et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv08034
Date Filed2018-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George H. Wu
PlaintiffCoalition for Humane Immigrant Rights
PlaintiffNational Partnership for New Americans
PlaintiffUnidosUS
PlaintiffCASA
PlaintiffEl Rescate
PlaintiffMichigan United
PlaintiffMi Familia Vota
PlaintiffNew York Immigration Coalition
PlaintiffOneAmerica
Case DescriptionThe Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights and a number of other immigrant rights organizations submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the approval or denial of N-400 naturalization applications. The organizations also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the coalition of immigrant rights' organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-171COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22428396 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Michigan United, UnidosUS, Mi Familia Vota, OneAmerica, National Partnership for New Americans, New York Immigration Coalition, CASA, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, El Rescate. (Attorney Peter A Schey added to party CASA(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party El Rescate(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Mi Familia Vota(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party Michigan United(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party National Partnership for New Americans(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party New York Immigration Coalition(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party OneAmerica(pty:pla), Attorney Peter A Schey added to party UnidosUS(pty:pla))(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CASA, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, El Rescate, Mi Familia Vota, Michigan United, National Partnership for New Americans, New York Immigration Coalition, OneAmerica, UnidosUS. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-173Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiffs CASA, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, El Rescate, Mi Familia Vota, Michigan United, National Partnership for New Americans, New York Immigration Coalition, OneAmerica, UnidosUS. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-174NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-185NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-186NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18760 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (esa) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-198Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-179PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michigan United, UnidosUS, Mi Familia Vota, OneAmerica, National Partnership for New Americans, New York Immigration Coalition, CASA, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, El Rescate, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Genoveva Ortega. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to service by certified mail. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to service by certified mail. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Schey, Peter) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-11-0810STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services answer now due 12/11/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-12-1111ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1212MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/10/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-2713EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending The Lapse of Appropriations filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-0314ORDER STAYING THE ENTIRE CASE DUE TO THE LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS by Judge George H. Wu re: 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case. The Court sets a status conference for January 31, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. The parties can appear telephonically with advanced notice. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-3115MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge George H. Wu: The Court lifts the stay issued on 12/27/2019, and sets a Rule 26(f) Conference for 2/11/2019 at 8:30 AM. Counsel are to fife a Joint Report by 2/7/2019. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (jp) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0716JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Plaintiffs CASA, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, El Rescate, Mi Familia Vota, Michigan United, National Partnership for New Americans, New York Immigration Coalition, OneAmerica, UnidosUS. (Schey, Peter) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-1117MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The scheduling conference is continued to March 25, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., with a joint scheduling report to be filed by noon on March 21, 2019. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-03-2118SUPPLEMENT to Report 16 filed by Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar