Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleProctor v. National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv05672
Date Filed2018-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffMelanie L Proctor
Case DescriptionMelanie Proctor submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning her deposition by the Office of the Independent Counsel in 1998. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Proctor's request under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Proctor filed an administrative appeal, which was also denied. Proctor then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-171COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against National Archives and Records Administration (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611015701). Filed by Melanie L Proctor. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-172Declaration of Melanie L. Proctor in Support of 1 Complaint, filed by Melanie L Proctor. (Related document(s) 1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-173Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-174CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-205Summons Issued as to National Archives and Records Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-266CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Melanie L Proctor. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-267MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Melanie L Proctor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-268CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melanie L Proctor re 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing, 6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-269SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie L Proctor. National Archives and Records Administration served on 9/25/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-2810ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar