Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02152
Date Filed2018-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and took a 10-day extension. After hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantPATRICK M. SHANAHAN
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-181COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5693368) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons DoD, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-182LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (zrdj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrdj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/26/18. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 9/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DoD receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-227Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) Modified relief on 10/23/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint by November 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/24/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/26/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-268ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by December 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/29/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/13/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-319Joint STATUS REPORT by JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before April 2, 2019 addressing the status of production and the need for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/5/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-03-0510NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar