Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFirst Amendment Coalition v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv05731
Date Filed2018-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffFirst Amendment Coalition
Case DescriptionThe First Amendment Coalition submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the agency's seizure of records from New York Times reporter Ali Watkins. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and took a 10-day extension for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FAC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-191COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the Freedom of Information Act ($400 fee paid by Trans. #0971-12691574) against U.S. Department of Justice. Filed byFirst Amendment Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knox, Leila) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-192Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-193Proposed Summons. (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-194Certificate of Interested Entities by First Amendment Coalition (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-195Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/19/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-19Electronic filing error . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 3 Proposed Summons filed by First Amendment Coalition Office of Information Policy is not a party to this case therefore the Proposed Summons Regarding Office of Information Policy (ONLY) will not be issued (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-206Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice; Alex G. Tse, U.S. Attorney. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-207MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12695863.) filed by First Amendment Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Goldman, Heather) (Filed on 9/20/2018) Modified on 9/21/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-218ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:granting 7 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-279NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. Goldman (Goldman, Heather) (Filed on 9/27/2018) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2710SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by First Amendment Coalition. U.S. Department of Justice served on 9/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. Alex Tse, U.S. Attorney (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 9/27/2018) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-0111SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by First Amendment Coalition. U.S. Dept. of Justice, Washington, DC (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0112NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Rex Myers (Myers, Roger) (Filed on 10/1/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0213NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Snyder (Snyder, David) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0314CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Amendment Coalition.. (Knox, Leila) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-2215ANSWER to 1 Complaint ; by U.S. Department of Justice. (Berman, Keri) (Filed on 10/22/2018) Modified on 10/23/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar