Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02167
Date Filed2018-09-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning three meetings held by the Food Safety and Inspection Service. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5697039) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-193MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Flr., San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-270. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5697056. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-21Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kellan Smith. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/24/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-244SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 10/3/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/03/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-11-026NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-027ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 16, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/2/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/16/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-168Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, and ORDERS that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 29, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2019-01-299Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report on or before March 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-1110NOTICE of Change of Address by George A. Kimbrell (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-1511Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/18/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar