Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02175
Date Filed2018-09-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the Wild Horse and Burro Program System database. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and gave WHFF an estimated completion date of April 2018. After hearing nothing further from the agency, WHFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-201COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5698873) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-202REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (3) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-24Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-094NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-315ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/1/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-146Joint STATUS REPORT (with proposed order) by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/19/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-067Joint STATUS REPORT by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/7/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-01-078Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Consent Motion to Stay. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report within three days after funding is restored for the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/8/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-299Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-30MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 27, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the stay in this case is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/30/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-2710Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Order by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/1/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-2111Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar